Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021