House | 05/18/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Permission to introduce | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |