House | 05/20/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Permission to introduce | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |