Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021