Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 17, 2021