Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB247 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/17/2021

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 247
 (In the Senate - Filed December 17, 2020; March 3, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 17, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 2; March 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to discrimination against or burdening certain
 constitutional rights of an applicant for or holder of a license to
 practice law in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 81, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 81.02401 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.02401.  CERTAIN RULES AND POLICIES PROHIBITED;
 ADMINISTRATIVE OR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF.  (a)  A rule or policy adopted
 or a penalty imposed under this chapter may not:
 (1)  limit an applicant's ability to obtain a license to
 practice law in this state, or a state bar member's ability to
 maintain or renew the license, based on a sincerely held religious
 belief of the applicant or state bar member; or
 (2)  burden an applicant's or state bar member's:
 (A)  free exercise of religion, regardless of
 whether the burden is the result of a rule or policy generally
 applicable to all applicants or state bar members;
 (B)  freedom of speech regarding a sincerely held
 religious belief;
 (C)  membership in any religious organization; or
 (D)  freedom of association.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a state bar rule or
 policy adopted or penalty imposed under this chapter that results
 in a limitation or burden described by Subsection (a) if the rule,
 policy, or penalty is:
 (1)  essential to enforcing a compelling governmental
 purpose; and
 (2)  narrowly tailored to accomplish that purpose.
 (c)  A person may assert that a state bar rule or policy
 adopted or penalty imposed under this chapter violates Subsection
 (a) as a defense in an administrative hearing or as a claim or
 defense in a judicial proceeding under Chapter 37, Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, except that the person may not assert the
 violation as a defense to:
 (1)  an allegation of sexual misconduct; or
 (2)  prosecution of an offense.
 (d)  A person may bring an action for injunctive relief for a
 violation of Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *