Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis March 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 6, 2021