Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB263 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 18, 2021