Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB270 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021
Analysis March 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 6, 2021