Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021