Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB272 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/19/2021

                            By: West S.B. No. 272
 (In the Senate - Filed December 30, 2020; March 3, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the board of trustees of each school district
 to create a nonvoting student trustee position on the board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.0512 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.0512.  STUDENT TRUSTEE.  (a)  In addition to the
 number of trustees of a school district as provided by Section
 11.051, the board of trustees of each school district shall appoint
 a student trustee in the manner provided by this section.
 (b)  The commissioner shall develop a uniform application
 form to be used to solicit eligible applicants for the position of
 student trustee.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), the principal of
 each high school in a school district shall:
 (1)  not later than November 1 of each year, solicit
 applicants for appointment to the next regular term of the position
 of student trustee of the school district using the uniform
 application form developed under Subsection (b);
 (2)  not later than January 1, select three applicants
 from the applications received to serve as the school's
 recommendations for the position of student trustee; and
 (3)  send the school's recommendations and
 corresponding applications to the president of the board of
 trustees of the school district.
 (d)  The principal of the high school at which a current
 student trustee is enrolled at the time of the student's
 appointment may not solicit applicants for the position of student
 trustee for the next regular term of the position.
 (e)  The president of the board of trustees of each school
 district shall select two or more applicants from the applications
 received to serve as recommendations to the board for the student
 trustee position.
 (f)  The board of trustees of a school district may request
 to review all applications for the position of student trustee
 received by the board president and may request an applicant to
 submit additional information.
 (g)  On June 1, or as soon as practicable thereafter, the
 board by majority vote shall appoint one of the applicants to serve
 as the student trustee for the district for a one-year term expiring
 May 31 of the following year.
 (h)  To be eligible for appointment as a student trustee for
 a school district, a person must:
 (1)  be enrolled as a student at a high school in the
 district; and
 (2)  be in good academic standing as determined by the
 school at which the student is enrolled at the time of appointment.
 (i)  Throughout a student's term as a student trustee, the
 student must:
 (1)  remain enrolled at the school; and
 (2)  maintain a grade point average of 2.5 on a
 four-point scale, or the equivalent.
 (j)  The principal of the school at which a student trustee
 is enrolled shall notify the president of the board of trustees of
 the school district if the student trustee fails to maintain the
 qualifications required by Subsection (i).  On receiving notice,
 the president of the board of trustees of the school district shall
 declare the position as vacant and as soon as practicable fill the
 vacancy in the manner prescribed by Subsection (l).
 (k)  A student trustee is not a member of the board of
 trustees of the school district for which the student is appointed.
 A student trustee has the same powers and duties as a member of the
 board of trustees, including the right to attend and participate in
 meetings of the board, except that the student trustee:
 (1)  may not vote on any matter before the board or make
 or second any motion before the board; and
 (2)  is not counted in determining whether a quorum
 exists for a meeting of the board or in determining the outcome of
 any vote of the board.
 (l)  A vacancy in the position of student trustee for a
 school district shall be filled for the unexpired term by
 appointment by the president of the board of trustees of the school
 district in consultation with the board.
 (m)  A student trustee serves without compensation but is
 entitled to be reimbursed for the actual expenses incurred by the
 student in attending meetings of the board, subject to the approval
 of the president of the board of trustees of the school district.
 (n)  A school district may grant to a student who fulfills
 the requirements of service of a student trustee not more than one
 academic course credit in a subject area determined appropriate by
 the district.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.0511, Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *