Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB288 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/12/2021

                    By: Seliger, Eckhardt, Paxton S.B. No. 288
 (In the Senate - Filed January 5, 2021; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 12, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 15, Nays 0; April 12, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 288 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to preventing the loss of benefits by certain retirees of
 the Teacher Retirement System of Texas who resume service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 824.601, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-3) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-1) or (b-3) or
 Section 824.602 and subject to Subsection (b-2), a retiree is not
 entitled to service or disability retirement benefit payments, as
 applicable, for any month in which the retiree is employed in any
 position by a Texas public educational institution.
 (b-3)  The retirement system may not under this section
 withhold a monthly benefit payment for a retiree who retired under
 Section 824.202 and qualified for an exception under Section
 824.602 unless:
 (1)  with respect to the first occurrence of the
 retiree's employment that does not qualify for the exception under
 Section 824.602, the system issued a written warning notifying the
 retiree of that fact; and
 (2)  in a month following the month in which the system
 issued the warning described by Subdivision (1) and with respect to
 a subsequent occurrence of the retiree's continued employment that
 does not qualify for the exception under Section 824.602, the
 system issued a written notice:
 (A)  warning the retiree of the fact described by
 Subdivision (2); and
 (B)  requiring the retiree to pay to the system,
 in a form and manner prescribed by the system, an amount elected by
 the retiree that equals the total sum the retiree:
 (i)  earned for all employment by Texas
 public educational institutions for each month occurring after the
 issuance of the warning under Subdivision (1) and before the month
 the system began withholding benefit payments under this section;
 or
 (ii)  received in retirement benefit
 payments for each month occurring after the issuance of the warning
 under Subdivision (1) and before the month the system began
 withholding benefit payments under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 824.601, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to the employment of a retiree of the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall adopt
 rules as necessary to implement Section 824.601, Government Code,
 as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *