Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021