Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB288 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 288


 AN ACT
 relating to preventing the loss of benefits of and the payment of
 certain employer contributions for certain retirees of the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas who resume service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 824.601, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-3) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-1) or Section
 824.602 and subject to Subsection (b-2) and, if applicable,
 Subsection (b-3), a retiree is not entitled to service or
 disability retirement benefit payments, as applicable, for any
 month in which the retiree is employed in any position by a Texas
 public educational institution.
 (b-3)  A retiree under Section 824.202 is subject to
 Subsection (b) only if the retirement system first issues the
 following notices to the retiree:
 (1)  with respect to the first occurrence of the
 retiree's employment that does not qualify for an exception under
 Section 824.602, the system issued a written warning notifying the
 retiree of that fact; and
 (2)  in a month following the month in which the system
 issued the warning described by Subdivision (1) and with respect to
 a subsequent occurrence of the retiree's continued employment that
 does not qualify for an exception under Section 824.602, the system
 issued a written notice:
 (A)  warning the retiree of the fact described by
 this subdivision; and
 (B)  requiring the retiree to pay to the system,
 in a form and manner prescribed by the system, an amount, as elected
 by the retiree, that equals the total sum the retiree:
 (i)  earned for all employment by Texas
 public educational institutions for each month occurring after the
 issuance of the warning under Subdivision (1) for which the retiree
 did not qualify for an exception under Section 824.602 and before
 the month the system issued the written notice described by this
 subdivision; or
 (ii)  received in retirement benefit
 payments for each month occurring after the issuance of the warning
 under Subdivision (1) for which the retiree did not qualify for an
 exception under Section 824.602 and before the month the system
 issued the written notice described by this subdivision.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter G, Chapter 824, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 824.6021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 824.6021.  TEMPORARY EXCEPTION TO MITIGATE LEARNING
 LOSS ATTRIBUTABLE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC. (a) Subject to Section
 825.506, the retirement system may not, under Section 824.601,
 withhold a monthly benefit payment if the retiree is employed in a
 Texas public educational institution, other than an institution of
 higher education, in a position performing duties related to the
 mitigation of student learning loss attributable to the coronavirus
 disease (COVID-19) pandemic, if the position:
 (1)  is in addition to the normal staffing level at the
 Texas public educational institution;
 (2)  is funded wholly by federal funds provided under
 federal law enacted for the purpose of providing relief related to
 the coronavirus disease (COVID-19) pandemic, including the
 Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security (CARES) Act (15
 U.S.C. Section 9001 et seq.), Coronavirus Response and Relief
 Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2021 (Div. M, Pub. L. No.
 116-260), or American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 (Pub. L. No. 117-2);
 and
 (3)  ends on or before December 31, 2024.
 (b)  The exception provided by this section:
 (1)  is in addition to the exceptions otherwise
 provided by Sections 824.601 and 824.602; and
 (2)  does not apply to disability retirees.
 (c)  This section expires February 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  Section 825.308, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 825.308.  STATE CONTRIBUTION ACCOUNT. The retirement
 system shall deposit in the state contribution account:
 (1)  all state contributions to the retirement system
 required by Section 825.404;
 (2)  amounts from the interest account as provided by
 Section 825.313(b)(2);
 (3)  retirement annuities waived or forfeited in
 accordance with Section 824.601 or 824.004;
 (3-a)  retiree earnings described by Section
 824.601(b-3)(2)(B)(i) that have been paid to the system;
 (4)  fees collected under Section 825.403(h);
 (5)  fees and interest for reinstatement of service
 credit or establishment of membership service credit as provided by
 Section 823.501;
 (6)  the portion of a deposit required by Section
 823.302 to establish military service credit that represents a fee;
 and
 (7)  employer contributions required under Section
 825.4092.
 SECTION 4.  Section 825.4092, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 the amounts required to be paid under Subsections (b) and (c) are
 not required to be paid by a reporting employer for a retiree who
 retired from the retirement system on or after September 1, 2005,
 and is employed in a position described by Section 824.6021(a).
 This subsection expires February 1, 2025.
 SECTION 5.  Section 824.601, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to the employment of a retiree of the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 6.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Teacher Retirement System of Texas shall adopt
 rules as necessary to implement Section 824.601, Government Code,
 as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 7.  Section 825.4092, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2021-2022 school year.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 288 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27,  2021,
 House granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 288 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor