|
06/08/2021
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/08/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 562
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#1784
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2085
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Motion prevails
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote RV#1353
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amended 2-Guerra
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Amended 1-Paddie
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 28-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 27-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 27-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 26-Guerra
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1331
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 25-Zwiener and Frank
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 24-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 24-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 23-Patterson
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 23-Patterson
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1330
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 22-Holland
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 21-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1329
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 20-Rodriguez, Shine, Biedermann, Toth, Howard, Schaefer, Slaton, Tinderholt, and C. Bell
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1328
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 19-Goldman
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1327
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 18-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 17-P. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 17-P. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1326
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 16-Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 15-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1325
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 14-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1324
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 13-Lucio
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 12-T. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 11-Martinez Fischer, Lopez, Minjarez, Gervin-Hawkins, Larson, Allison, Pacheco, Cortez, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 10-Morales Shaw
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1323
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Record vote RV#1322
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-Tinderholt
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 6-Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 5-Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Guerra
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 3-Morales Shaw
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amended 2-Paddie
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Springer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Springer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Hancock
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Rules suspended-Intent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|