Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB30 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2021
Analysis May 6, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021