Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB312 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 10, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021