|
05/24/2021
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
05/24/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/12/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#787
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3520
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|