Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB318 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021