Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB32 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/09/2020

                            87R3804 TYPED
 By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 32


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a student loan repayment assistance program for certain
 professionals for exceptional service to the State of Texas during
 the coronavirus pandemic.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Thanking Our
 Frontline Heroes Student Loan Relief Act.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter NO to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER NO: FRONTLINE WORKERS LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE
 PROGRAM
 Sec. 61.9961.  DEFINITION. (a) In this subchapter,
 "frontline worker" means any person providing health, education,
 public safety, or other necessary support services related to the
 coronavirus pandemic, as determined by the board.
 (b)  The board, in consultation with relevant state
 agencies, shall develop a list of occupations that can qualify as a
 frontline worker, which shall include:
 (1)  employees of public schools, open enrollment
 charter schools, and private schools;
 (2)  employees of public and private institutions of
 higher education;
 (3)  peace officers;
 (4)  fire fighters;
 (5)  emergency medical technicians;
 (6)  medical professionals, including doctors,
 physician assistants, nurses, nurse practitioners, mental health
 professionals, and hospital support personnel;
 (7)  employees of nursing homes, state supported living
 centers, or similar long-term care facilities;
 (8)  employees of child care facilities;
 (9)  social workers; and
 (10)  members of the Texas military forces, United
 State armed forces, or a reserve component of the armed forces who
 participated in coronavirus-related service.
 Sec. 61.9962.  LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE AUTHORIZED;
 PURPOSE. The board shall establish and administer a program to
 provide, in accordance with this subchapter and board rules, loan
 repayment assistance in the repayment of eligible loans for
 eligible frontline workers who provided necessary services during
 the coronavirus pandemic.
 Sec. 61.9963.  ELIGIBILITY. (a) To be eligible to receive
 loan repayment assistance under this subchapter, a person must:
 (1)  be a Texas resident at the time of application;
 (2)  for a substantial portion, as determined by board
 rules, of the period between March 15, 2020 and December 31, 2020,
 have been employed as a frontline worker; and
 (3)  submit to the board an application for the loan
 repayment assistance, in the manner and on a form prescribed by the
 board, that requires:
 (A)  employer verification or other
 documentation, as established by board rule, of the person's
 employment as a frontline worker in the specified period of time;
 and
 (B)  a statement of the total amount of principal,
 accrued interest, fees, and other charges due on all outstanding
 eligible loans for which the person is applying for repayment
 assistance;
 (4)  have earned a degree or certification from a
 public or private institution of higher education or earned at
 least 30 semester credit hours before the person's initial
 employment as a frontline worker; and
 (5)  comply with any other requirement adopted by the
 board under this subchapter.
 (b)  The board shall establish by rule a time period during
 which applications may be submitted of no less than 90 calendar
 days.
 Sec. 61.9964.  AWARD. (a) Except as provided by this
 section, an eligible person is entitled to receive an amount of loan
 repayment assistance under this chapter payable to the holders of
 the eligible person's eligible loans in an amount equal to the
 lesser of $5,000 or the balance of the total amount stated in the
 person's application under Sec. 61.9963, subject to the amount of
 available funding.
 (b)  An eligible person may receive only one award under this
 subchapter.
 (c)  If the amount of money available for loan repayment
 assistance under this subchapter is insufficient to provide loan
 repayment assistance to all eligible persons, the board shall
 establish criteria to determine the amount of available money to
 allocate to the holders of student loans of eligible persons as the
 board determines appropriate to further the purpose of this
 subchapter.
 (d)  An eligible person whose loan repayment assistance
 under this section is less than the amount necessary to cover the
 amount of principal and interest due on the person's eligible loans
 for the period in which the award is disbursed is responsible for
 the payment of the remainder of the amount due and for otherwise
 preventing a default on the loan.
 Sec. 61.6695.  ELIGIBLE LOANS. (a) The board may provide
 loan repayment assistance under this subchapter for the repayment
 of any student loan received by an eligible person through any
 lender for the cost of attendance at an institution of higher
 education or a private or independent institution of higher
 education.
 (b)  If the loan is not a state or federal guaranteed student
 loan, the promissory note or other loan agreement document
 governing the terms of the loan must require all the loan proceeds
 to be used for expenses incurred by a person in attending an
 institution of higher education or a private or independent
 institution of higher education.
 Sec. 61.9966.  PAYMENT OF LOAN REPAYMENT ASSISTANCE.
 (a) The board shall pay any loan repayment assistance under this
 subchapter in a lump sum delivered on the eligible person's behalf
 directly to the holder of the loan.
 (b)  Loan repayment assistance provided under this
 subchapter may be applied to any amount due on the loan.
 (c)  The board shall attempt to allocate all money available
 to the board for the purpose of providing loan repayment assistance
 under this subchapter.
 Sec. 61.9967.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The board may
 solicit and accept gifts, grants, and other donations from any
 public or private source for the purposes of this subchapter.
 Sec. 61.9968.  RULES; POSTING REQUIRED. (a) The board shall
 adopt rules necessary for the administration of this subchapter.
 (b)  The board shall post on the board's Internet website a
 copy of the rules adopted under this subchapter and information
 regarding the program established under this subchapter.
 (c)  The board may advertise in any available media or
 otherwise promote the loan repayment assistance program to further
 the purposes of this chapter.
 Sec. 61.9969.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires December
 31, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 shall adopt rules for the frontline workers loan repayment
 assistance program under Subchapter NO, Chapter 61, Education Code,
 as added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2021.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.