Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB325 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+87R887 GCB-D
12 By: West S.B. No. 325
2- (In the Senate - Filed January 12, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 30, 2021,
4- reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 4;
5- April 30, 2021, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
73
84
95 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
106 AN ACT
117 relating to providing mental health services and mental health
128 education to public school students at school-based health centers.
139 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1410 SECTION 1. Section 38.051(a), Education Code, is amended to
1511 read as follows:
1612 (a) A school district in this state may, if the district
1713 identifies the need, design a model in accordance with this
1814 subchapter for the delivery of cooperative health care programs for
1915 students and their families and may compete for grants awarded
2016 under this subchapter. The model may provide for the delivery of:
2117 (1) conventional health services;
2218 (2) mental health services; and
2319 (3) disease prevention of emerging health threats that
2420 are specific to the district.
2521 SECTION 2. Section 38.058, Education Code, is amended to
2622 read as follows:
2723 Sec. 38.058. HEALTH EDUCATION AND HEALTH CARE ADVISORY
2824 COUNCIL. (a) The board of trustees of a school district or the
2925 governing body of an open-enrollment charter school may establish
3026 and appoint members to a local health education and health care
3127 advisory council to make recommendations to the district or school
3228 on the establishment of school-based health centers to provide
3329 health care services, including mental health services, and to
3430 assist the district or school in ensuring that local community
3531 values are reflected in the operation of each center and in the
3632 provision of health education and mental health education.
3733 (b) A majority of the members of the council must be parents
3834 of students enrolled in the school district or open-enrollment
3935 charter school. In addition to the appointees who are parents of
4036 students, the board of trustees or governing body shall also
4137 appoint at least one person from each of the following groups:
4238 (1) classroom teachers;
4339 (2) school administrators;
4440 (3) school counselors;
4541 (4) health care professionals licensed or certified to
4642 practice in this state;
4743 (5) mental health care professionals licensed to
4844 practice in this state;
4945 (6) the clergy;
5046 (7) [(6)] law enforcement;
5147 (8) [(7)] the business community;
5248 (9) [(8)] senior citizens; and
5349 (10) [(9)] students.
5450 SECTION 3. Section 38.063(c), Education Code, is amended to
5551 read as follows:
5652 (c) All health care programs should be designed to meet the
5753 following goals:
5854 (1) reducing student absenteeism;
5955 (2) increasing a student's ability to meet the
6056 student's academic potential; and
6157 (3) stabilizing the physical and mental well-being of
6258 a student.
6359 SECTION 4. Section 38.064(a), Education Code, is amended to
6460 read as follows:
6561 (a) Based on statistics obtained from every school-based
6662 health center in this state that receives funding through the
6763 Department of State Health Services, the Department of State Health
6864 Services shall issue a biennial report to the legislature about the
6965 relative efficacy of services delivered by the centers during the
7066 preceding two years and any increased academic success of students
7167 at campuses served by those centers, with special emphasis on any:
7268 (1) increased attendance, including attendance
7369 information regarding students with chronic illnesses;
7470 (2) decreased drop-out rates;
7571 (3) improved student health, including improved
7672 mental health;
7773 (4) increased student immunization rates;
7874 (5) increased student participation in preventive
7975 health measures, including routine physical examinations and
8076 checkups conducted in accordance with the Texas Health Steps
8177 program; and
8278 (6) improved performance on student assessment
8379 instruments administered under Subchapter B, Chapter 39.
8480 SECTION 5. The board of trustees of a school district or the
8581 governing body of an open-enrollment charter school that has
8682 established a local health education and health care advisory
8783 council under Section 38.058, Education Code, shall appoint to the
8884 council a mental health professional licensed in this state, as
8985 required by the change in law made by this Act, as soon as
9086 practicable and not later than January 1, 2022.
9187 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9288 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9389 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9490 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9591 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
96- * * * * *