Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB343 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis March 11, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021