Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB355 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021