Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB369 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2021

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 369
 (In the Senate - Filed January 15, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 19, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 369 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement to submit a financial aid application
 as a condition of high school graduation for public school
 students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 28.0256(a), (c), (d), and (e),
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Before graduating from high school, each student must
 complete and submit a free application for federal student aid
 (FAFSA) or a Texas application for state financial aid (TASFA),
 except as otherwise provided by Subsection (b).
 (c)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school
 shall adopt a form to be used for purposes of Subsection (b). The
 form must [be]:
 (1)  be approved by the agency; [and]
 (2)  provide the student or the student's parent or
 other person standing in parental relation, as applicable, the
 opportunity to decline to complete and submit a financial aid
 application, as provided by Subsection (b); and
 (3)  be made available in English, Spanish, and any
 other language spoken by a majority of the students enrolled in a
 bilingual education or special language program under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 29, in the district or school.
 (d)  If a school counselor notifies a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school whether a student has complied with
 this section for purposes of determining whether the student meets
 high school graduation requirements under Section 28.025, the
 school counselor may only indicate whether the student has complied
 with this section and may not indicate the manner in which the
 student complied, except as necessary for the district or school to
 comply with rules adopted under Subsection (e)(2). A school
 counselor may not indicate that a student has not complied with this
 section if the school district or open-enrollment charter school
 fails to provide the form adopted under Subsection (c) to the
 student or the student's parent or other person standing in
 parental relation to the student.
 (e)  The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section, including rules to:
 (1)  establish:
 (A)  a timeline for:
 (i)  the distribution to students of the
 free application for federal student aid or Texas application for
 state financial aid and the form adopted under Subsection (c); and
 (ii)  the submission of a form under
 Subsection (b);
 (B)  standards regarding the information that a
 school district or open-enrollment charter school must provide to
 students regarding:
 (i)  in accordance with Section
 33.007(b)(5), instructions for filling out the free application for
 federal student aid or Texas application for state financial aid;
 and
 (ii)  the options available to a student
 under Subsection (b) if the student wishes to decline to complete
 and submit a financial aid application; and
 (C)  the method by which a student must provide to
 a school district or open-enrollment charter school proof that the
 student has completed and submitted the free application for
 federal student aid or Texas application for state financial aid as
 required by this section;
 (2)  require each school district and open-enrollment
 charter school to report to the agency:
 (A)  the number of students who completed and
 submitted a financial aid application under Subsection (a); and
 (B)  the number of students who received an
 exception from complying with Subsection (a) under Subsection (b);
 and
 (3)  ensure compliance with federal law regarding
 confidentiality of student educational information, including the
 Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 (20 U.S.C.
 Section 1232g), and any state law relating to the privacy of student
 information.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *