Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB369 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021