Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2021
Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021