Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021
Analysis March 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021