Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB403 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021