Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB45 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis March 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 7, 2021