Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB495 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 495
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 495 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain rights of crime victims.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 56A.051(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A victim, guardian of a victim, or close relative of a
 deceased victim is entitled to the following rights within the
 criminal justice system:
 (1)  the right to receive from a law enforcement agency
 adequate protection from harm and threats of harm arising from
 cooperation with prosecution efforts;
 (2)  the right to:
 (A)  have the magistrate consider the safety of
 the victim or the victim's family in setting the amount of bail for
 the defendant;
 (B)  be informed of the amount of bail set for the
 defendant; and
 (C)  request that the attorney representing the
 state ask the magistrate to adjust the amount of bail as necessary
 to ensure the safety of the victim or the victim's family;
 (3)  if requested, the right to be informed:
 (A)  by the attorney representing the state of
 relevant court proceedings, including appellate proceedings, and
 to be informed if those proceedings have been canceled or
 rescheduled before the event; and
 (B)  by an appellate court of the court's
 decisions, after the decisions are entered but before the decisions
 are made public;
 (4)  when requested, the right to be informed:
 (A)  by a peace officer concerning the defendant's
 right to bail and the procedures in criminal investigations; and
 (B)  by the office of the attorney representing
 the state concerning the general procedures in the criminal justice
 system, including general procedures in guilty plea negotiations
 and arrangements, restitution, and the appeals and parole process;
 (5)  the right to provide pertinent information to a
 community supervision and corrections department conducting a
 presentencing investigation concerning the impact of the offense on
 the victim and the victim's family by testimony, written statement,
 or any other manner before any sentencing of the defendant;
 (6)  the right to receive information regarding
 compensation to victims of crime as provided by Chapter 56B,
 including information related to the costs that may be compensated
 under that chapter and the amount of compensation, eligibility for
 compensation, and procedures for application for compensation
 under that chapter, the payment for a forensic medical examination
 under Article 56A.252 for a victim of an alleged sexual assault, and
 when requested, to referral to available social service agencies
 that may offer additional assistance;
 (7)  the right to:
 (A)  be informed, on request, of parole
 procedures;
 (B)  participate in the parole process;
 (C)  provide to the board for inclusion in the
 defendant's file information to be considered by the board before
 the parole of any defendant convicted of any offense subject to this
 chapter; and
 (D)  be notified, if requested, of parole
 proceedings concerning a defendant in the victim's case and of the
 defendant's release;
 (8)  the right to be provided with a waiting area,
 separate or secure from other witnesses, including the defendant
 and relatives of the defendant, before testifying in any proceeding
 concerning the defendant; if a separate waiting area is not
 available, other safeguards should be taken to minimize the
 victim's contact with the defendant and the defendant's relatives
 and witnesses, before and during court proceedings;
 (9)  the right to the prompt return of any of the
 victim's property that is held by a law enforcement agency or the
 attorney representing the state as evidence when the property is no
 longer required for that purpose;
 (10)  the right to have the attorney representing the
 state notify the victim's employer, if requested, that the victim's
 cooperation and testimony is necessary in a proceeding that may
 require the victim to be absent from work for good cause;
 (11)  the right to request victim-offender mediation
 coordinated by the victim services division of the department;
 (12)  the right to be informed of the uses of a victim
 impact statement and the statement's purpose in the criminal
 justice system as described by Subchapter D, to complete the victim
 impact statement, and to have the victim impact statement
 considered:
 (A)  by the attorney representing the state and
 the judge before sentencing or before a plea bargain agreement is
 accepted; and
 (B)  by the board before a defendant is released
 on parole;
 (13)  for a victim of an assault or sexual assault who
 is younger than 17 years of age or whose case involves family
 violence, as defined by Section 71.004, Family Code, the right to
 have the court consider the impact on the victim of a continuance
 requested by the defendant; if requested by the attorney
 representing the state or by the defendant's attorney, the court
 shall state on the record the reason for granting or denying the
 continuance; and
 (14)  if the offense is a capital felony, the right to:
 (A)  receive by mail from the court a written
 explanation of defense-initiated victim outreach if the court has
 authorized expenditures for a defense-initiated victim outreach
 specialist;
 (B)  not be contacted by the victim outreach
 specialist unless the victim, guardian, or relative has consented
 to the contact by providing a written notice to the court; and
 (C)  designate a victim service provider to
 receive all communications from a victim outreach specialist acting
 on behalf of any person.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *