Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB495 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 23, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021