Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB500 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 500


 AN ACT
 relating to creating the criminal offense of operating a boarding
 home facility without a permit and to a study regarding the
 regulation of group homes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 260, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 260.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 260.0051.  CRIMINAL PENALTY. (a)  This section applies
 only to a county or municipality that requires a person to obtain a
 permit to operate a boarding home facility as authorized by Section
 260.004.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person operates a
 boarding home facility without a permit in a county or municipality
 to which this section applies.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall conduct a study on state and local regulation of group homes.
 (b)  The study must:
 (1)  identify and evaluate state laws relating to the
 regulation of group homes, including:
 (A)  a boarding home facility, as defined by
 Section 260.001, Health and Safety Code; and
 (B)  a community home, described by Chapter 123,
 Human Resources Code;
 (2)  analyze the procedures for filing complaints
 against group homes and make recommendations to expedite complaint
 processes;
 (3)  analyze complaints filed against group homes in
 the preceding 10 years;
 (4)  analyze the enforcement authority over group homes
 granted to state and local governmental agencies, including the
 authority of counties and municipalities to enforce boarding home
 regulations;
 (5)  recommend whether additional state and local
 governmental enforcement authority over group homes is needed;
 (6)  recommend processes to expedite the licensing of
 and regulatory procedures for group homes;
 (7)  determine whether new categories of group homes
 should be licensed or regulated by state or local governmental
 agencies;
 (8)  discuss and recommend methods for identifying
 unlicensed group homes; and
 (9)  evaluate whether Section 260.011, Health and
 Safety Code, which prohibits a county or municipality from
 excluding boarding home facilities from residential areas by zoning
 and similar regulations, prevents certain counties and
 municipalities from regulating boarding home facilities.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall prepare a written or electronic report
 that includes a summary of the results of the study conducted under
 this section and any legislative recommendations based on the study
 and submit the report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker
 of the house of representatives, and members of the standing
 committees of the senate and the house of representatives with
 jurisdiction over the Health and Human Services Commission.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 92,
 Nays 55, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor