Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB505 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021