Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB513 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 6, 2021