Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 17, 2021