Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB572 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 572


 AN ACT
 relating to in-person visitation of religious counselors with
 certain health care facility patients and residents during a public
 health emergency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The purpose of Chapter 260C, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, is to protect the religious liberty of
 each patient or resident of a health care facility and to protect
 health care facilities from costly lawsuits and administrative
 complaints based on religious discrimination by allowing patients
 and residents to receive in-person visitation with a religious
 counselor, provided that the health care facilities ensure
 compliance with health and safety requirements.
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle B, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 260C to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 260C. IN-PERSON VISITATION WITH RELIGIOUS COUNSELOR
 Sec. 260C.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Health care facility" means:
 (A)  a home and community support services agency
 licensed under Chapter 142;
 (B)  a hospital licensed under Chapter 241;
 (C)  a nursing facility licensed under Chapter
 242;
 (D)  a continuing care facility regulated under
 Chapter 246;
 (E)  an assisted living facility licensed under
 Chapter 247; or
 (F)  a special care facility licensed under
 Chapter 248.
 (2)  "Public health emergency" means:
 (A)  a state of disaster or local disaster
 declared under Chapter 418, Government Code; or
 (B)  a public health disaster as defined by
 Section 81.003.
 (3)  "Religious counselor" means an individual acting
 substantially in a pastoral or religious capacity to provide
 spiritual counsel to other individuals.
 Sec. 260C.002.  IN-PERSON VISITATION WITH RELIGIOUS
 COUNSELOR. (a) A health care facility may not prohibit a resident or
 patient of the facility from receiving in-person visitation with a
 religious counselor during a public health emergency on the request
 of:
 (1)  the patient or resident; or
 (2)  if the patient or resident is incapacitated, the
 patient's or resident's legally authorized representative,
 including a family member of the patient or resident.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the executive
 commissioner by rule shall develop guidelines to assist health care
 facilities in establishing in-person religious counselor
 visitation policies and procedures. The guidelines must:
 (1)  establish minimum health and safety requirements
 for in-person visitation with religious counselors;
 (2)  allow health care facilities to adopt reasonable
 time, place, and manner restrictions on in-person visitation with
 religious counselors to:
 (A)  mitigate the spread of a communicable
 disease; and
 (B)  address the patient's or resident's medical
 condition;
 (3)  provide special consideration to patients and
 residents who are receiving end-of-life care; and
 (4)  allow health care facilities to condition
 in-person visitation with religious counselors on the counselor's
 compliance with guidelines, policies, and procedures established
 under this subsection.
 (c)  A health care facility may prohibit in-person
 visitation with a religious counselor during a public health
 emergency if federal law or a federal agency requires the health
 care facility to prohibit in-person visitation during that period.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission by rule shall establish the guidelines required
 by Section 260C.002, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 572 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 572 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor