Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB576 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021