Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB58 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 9, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021