Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021