Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 20, 2021