Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB6 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021