Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 23, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021