Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB62 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2021