Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB623 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 17, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021