Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB629 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+87R6462 EAS-F
12 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 629
2- (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2021; March 11, 2021,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4- April 7, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2021,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 629 By: Nichols
93
104
115 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
126 AN ACT
13- relating to cemeteries in certain municipalities.
7+ relating to an exemption for certain cemeteries from cemetery
8+ location restrictions.
149 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1510 SECTION 1. Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, is
16- amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (l) to
11+ amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
1712 read as follows:
18- (a) Except as provided by Subsections (b), (f), (g), (g-1),
19- (h), [and] (k), and (l), an individual, corporation, partnership,
20- firm, trust, or association may not establish or operate a
21- cemetery, or use any land for the interment of remains, located:
22- (1) in or within one mile of the boundaries of a
23- municipality with a population of 5,000 to 25,000;
24- (2) in or within two miles of the boundaries of a
25- municipality with a population of 25,000 to 50,000;
26- (3) in or within three miles of the boundaries of a
27- municipality with a population of 50,000 to 100,000;
28- (4) in or within four miles of the boundaries of a
29- municipality with a population of 100,000 to 200,000; or
30- (5) in or within five miles of the boundaries of a
31- municipality with a population of at least 200,000.
32- (l) Not later than September 1, 2022, an individual,
33- corporation, partnership, firm, trust, or association may file a
34- written application with the governing body of a municipality to
35- which this subsection applies to establish or use a cemetery
36- located inside the legal boundaries of the municipality. The
37- municipality by ordinance shall prescribe the information to be
38- included in the application. The governing body by ordinance may
39- authorize the establishment or use of the cemetery if the
40- municipality determines and states in the ordinance that the
41- establishment or use of the cemetery does not adversely affect
42- public health, safety, and welfare. This subsection applies only
43- to a municipality:
13+ (b) Subsection (a) does not apply to:
14+ (1) a cemetery heretofore established and operating;
15+ (2) the establishment and use of a columbarium by an
16+ organized religious society or sect that is exempt from income
17+ taxation under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by
18+ being listed under Section 501(c)(3) of that code, as part of or
19+ attached to the principal church building owned by the society or
20+ sect;
21+ (3) the establishment and use of a columbarium by an
22+ organized religious society or sect that is exempt from income
23+ taxation under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by
24+ being listed under Section 501(c)(3) of that code, on land that:
25+ (A) is owned by the society or sect; and
26+ (B) is part of the campus on which an existing
27+ principal church building is located;
28+ (4) the establishment and use of a columbarium on the
29+ campus of a private or independent institution of higher education,
30+ as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, that is wholly or
31+ substantially controlled, managed, owned, or supported by or
32+ otherwise affiliated with an organized religious society or sect
33+ that is exempt from income taxation under Section 501(a), Internal
34+ Revenue Code of 1986, by being listed under Section 501(c)(3) of
35+ that code, if a place of worship is located on the campus;
36+ (5) the establishment and use of a mausoleum that is:
37+ (A) constructed beneath the principal church
38+ building owned by an organized religious society or sect that:
39+ (i) is exempt from income taxation under
40+ Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being listed
41+ under Section 501(c)(3) of that code; and
42+ (ii) has recognized religious traditions
43+ and practices of interring the remains of ordained clergy in or
44+ below the principal church building; and
45+ (B) used only for the interment of the remains of
46+ ordained clergy of that organized religious society or sect;
47+ (6) the establishment and operation, if authorized in
48+ accordance with Subsection (h), of a perpetual care cemetery [by an
49+ organized religious society or sect] that:
50+ (A) is exempt from income taxation under Section
51+ 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being listed under
52+ Section 501(c)(3) of that code;
53+ (B) has been in existence for at least five
54+ years;
55+ (C) has at least $500,000 in assets; and
56+ (D) establishes and operates the cemetery on land
57+ that:
58+ (i) is owned by the society or sect;
59+ (ii) together with any other land owned by
60+ the society or sect and adjacent to the land on which the cemetery
61+ is located, is not less than 10 acres; and
62+ (iii) is in a municipality with a
63+ population of at least one million that is located predominantly in
64+ a county that has a total area of less than 1,000 square miles; or
65+ (7) the establishment and use of a private family
66+ cemetery by an organization that is exempt from income taxation
67+ under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being
68+ listed under Section 501(c)(3) of that code, on land that is:
69+ (A) owned by the organization; and
70+ (B) located in a county:
71+ (i) with a population of more than 125,000;
72+ and
73+ (ii) that is adjacent to a county that has a
74+ population of more than 1.5 million and in which more than 75
75+ percent of the population lives in a single municipality.
76+ (d-1) Subsection (a) does not apply to a cemetery
77+ established and operating before September 1, 2021, in a
78+ municipality:
4479 (1) with a population of not less than 75,000 and not
4580 more than 95,000; and
4681 (2) in which a state veterans cemetery is located.
4782 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
48- * * * * *