Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB63 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 17, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis April 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021