Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB635 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 635
1+By: Lucio S.B. No. 635
2+ (Lucio III)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the terms and qualifications of the members of the port
68 commission of, and the powers, duties, and territory of, the Port of
79 Harlingen Authority; authorizing the imposition of a tax.
810 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
911 SECTION 1. Chapter 5013, Special District Local Laws Code,
1012 is amended by designating Sections 5013.001 and 5013.002 as
1113 Subchapter A and adding a subchapter heading to read as follows:
1214 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
1315 SECTION 2. Section 5013.001, Special District Local Laws
1416 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1517 Sec. 5013.001. DEFINITIONS [DEFINITION]. In this chapter:
1618 (1) "Authority"[, "authority"] means the Port of
1719 Harlingen Authority.
1820 (2) "Port commission" means the governing body of the
1921 authority.
2022 (3) "Port commissioner" means a member of the port
2123 commission.
2224 (4) "Treasurer" means the treasurer of the authority.
2325 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 5013, Special District
2426 Local Laws Code, as added by this Act, is amended by adding Section
2527 5013.0025 to read as follows:
2628 Sec. 5013.0025. AUTHORITY TERRITORY. The authority is
2729 composed of the original territory of the district, as it may have
2830 been amended by Subchapter H, Chapter 62, Water Code, or other law,
2931 except the territory does not include any portion of Willacy
3032 County.
3133 SECTION 4. Chapter 5013, Special District Local Laws Code,
3234 is amended by adding Subchapter B, and a heading is added to that
3335 subchapter to read as follows:
3436 SUBCHAPTER B. PORT COMMISSION
3537 SECTION 5. Section 5013.003, Special District Local Laws
3638 Code, is transferred to Subchapter B, Chapter 5013, Special
3739 District Local Laws Code, as added by this Act, redesignated as
3840 Section 5013.051, and amended to read as follows:
3941 Sec. 5013.051 [5013.003]. GOVERNING BODY. (a) The
4042 navigation and canal commission of the authority is called the port
4143 commission and is composed of five port commissioners.
4244 (b) The port commissioners shall be elected by the voters of
4345 the district at large to positions numbered one through five.
4446 (c) Port commissioners serve staggered four-year terms,
4547 with port commissioners elected in odd-numbered years.
4648 SECTION 6. Chapter 5013, Special District Local Laws Code,
4749 is amended by adding Subchapters C and D to read as follows:
4850 SUBCHAPTER C. POWERS AND DUTIES
4951 Sec. 5013.101. TREASURER. (a) The port commission:
5052 (1) shall hire or appoint a treasurer; and
5153 (2) may terminate or suspend the employment or
5254 appointment of the treasurer.
5355 (b) The treasurer has the power and duties of a treasurer
5456 under Chapters 60 and 62, Water Code.
5557 (c) Notwithstanding Section 62.152, Water Code, the
5658 treasurer shall pay all authority expenses from authority funds.
5759 Sec. 5013.102. SALES AND LEASES. (a) Except as provided by
5860 this section, the provisions of Subchapter C, Chapter 60, Water
5961 Code, apply to all sales and leases entered into by the authority.
6062 (b) Notwithstanding Section 60.039, Water Code, the
6163 authority may enter into a surface lease for a period of not more
6264 than 99 years.
6365 (c) Notwithstanding Section 60.040, Water Code, the
6466 authority is not required to publish notice for a sale, easement, or
6567 lease for a period of not more than 99 years.
6668 (d) Sections 60.041 and 60.042, Water Code, do not apply to
6769 a bid on real property to be sold by the authority.
6870 SUBCHAPTER D. FINANCIAL PROVISIONS
6971 Sec. 5013.151. MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION TAX; TAX RATE.
7072 (a) The authority may impose an ad valorem tax at a rate not to
7173 exceed 10 cents on each $100 valuation of all taxable property in
7274 the authority for the maintenance, operation, and upkeep of the
7375 authority and the improvements constructed by the authority.
7476 (b) The authority may change the rate or suspend collection
7577 of the tax authorized by this section in the manner provided by law
7678 for official action by the authority, subject to the limitation
7779 prescribed by Subsection (a).
7880 (c) Section 62.160, Water Code, does not apply to the
7981 authority.
8082 Sec. 5013.152. SELECTION OF DEPOSITORY. (a) Except as
8183 provided by this section, the authority shall select a depository
8284 for the authority in the manner provided by Section 60.271, Water
8385 Code.
8486 (b) The authority shall select a depository in a manner to
8587 ensure that authority funds are fully insured by the Federal
8688 Deposit Insurance Corporation or the National Credit Union Share
8789 Insurance Fund.
8890 (c) The authority may select more than one institution to
8991 serve as a depository in order to comply with the requirement under
9092 Subsection (b).
9193 SECTION 7. (a) In this section, "authority," "port
9294 commission," and "port commissioner" have the meanings assigned by
9395 Section 5013.001, Special District Local Laws Code, as amended by
9496 this Act.
9597 (b) A port commissioner of the authority who is serving on
9698 the day before the effective date of this Act shall serve until a
9799 successor qualifies following an election under Subsection (c) of
98100 this section.
99101 (c) On the uniform election date in November 2021, the port
100102 commission shall hold an election to elect two port commissioners,
101103 numbered four and five.
102104 (d) The three port commissioners serving on the effective
103105 date of this Act shall draw lots to assign port commissioner numbers
104106 one through three and determine which two port commissioners shall
105107 serve a term expiring December 1, 2023, and which port commissioner
106108 shall serve a term expiring December 1, 2025.
107109 (e) On the uniform election date in November 2023, the port
108110 commission shall hold an election to elect two port commissioners
109111 to terms of four years.
110112 (f) On the uniform election date in 2025, the port
111113 commission shall hold an election to elect three port commissioners
112114 to terms of four years.
113115 SECTION 8. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
114116 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
115117 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
116118 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
117119 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
118120 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
119121 Government Code.
120122 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
121123 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
122124 Environmental Quality.
123125 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
124126 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
125127 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
126128 representatives within the required time.
127129 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
128130 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
129131 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
130132 and accomplished.
131133 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
132134 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
133135 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
134136 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
135137 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
136- ______________________________ ______________________________
137- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
138- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 635 passed the Senate on
139- April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
140- ______________________________
141- Secretary of the Senate
142- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 635 passed the House on
143- April 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 34, two
144- present not voting.
145- ______________________________
146- Chief Clerk of the House
147- Approved:
148- ______________________________
149- Date
150- ______________________________
151- Governor