Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB655 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Schwertner, Buckingham, Springer S.B. No. 655
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 20, 2021, rereferred to Committee on Administration;
 April 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 655 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of distilled spirits to ultimate consumers by
 the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 14.05(c) and (f), Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit may
 not under Subsection (b) sell more than four [two] 750 milliliter
 bottles of distilled spirits or the equivalent to the same consumer
 within a 30-day period.
 (f)  The permit holder must [check a purchaser's
 identification and] keep records of sales [purchases] in a manner
 that enables the permit holder to comply with this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *