Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | By: Schwertner, Buckingham S.B. No. 655 | |
2 | - | Springer | |
1 | + | By: Schwertner, Buckingham, Springer S.B. No. 655 | |
2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2021; March 11, 2021, | |
3 | + | read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; | |
4 | + | April 20, 2021, rereferred to Committee on Administration; | |
5 | + | April 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee | |
6 | + | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, | |
7 | + | sent to printer.) | |
8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote | |
9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 655 By: Huffman | |
3 | 10 | ||
4 | 11 | ||
5 | 12 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
6 | 13 | AN ACT | |
7 | 14 | relating to the sale of distilled spirits to ultimate consumers by | |
8 | 15 | the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit. | |
9 | 16 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
10 | 17 | SECTION 1. Sections 14.05(c) and (f), Alcoholic Beverage | |
11 | 18 | Code, are amended to read as follows: | |
12 | 19 | (c) The holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit may | |
13 | 20 | not under Subsection (b) sell more than four [two] 750 milliliter | |
14 | 21 | bottles of distilled spirits or the equivalent to the same consumer | |
15 | 22 | within a 30-day period. | |
16 | 23 | (f) The permit holder must [check a purchaser's | |
17 | 24 | identification and] keep records of sales [purchases] in a manner | |
18 | 25 | that enables the permit holder to comply with this section. | |
19 | 26 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. | |
27 | + | * * * * * |