Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB659 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021